Global Patent Index - EP 0843802 B1

EP 0843802 B1 2001-12-19 - PRODUCT TRAY FOR DRYING A PRODUCT

Title (en)

PRODUCT TRAY FOR DRYING A PRODUCT

Title (de)

PRODUKTSCHALE FÜR DIE TROCKNUNG EINES PRODUKTES

Title (fr)

PLATEAU POUR LE SECHAGE D'UN PRODUIT

Publication

EP 0843802 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920478 A

Priority

  • CH 9700196 W
  • CH 137296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746841A1] A product tray (3) has a bottom (7) that is improved with respect to heat transmission from a heating plate (8) to the product (9). The bottom (7) is made of a flexible, thin, heat-resistant material. Therefore, it can make a good form fit to the heating plate (8), especially when under load by the product (9), which results in a good thermal contact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 25/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746841 A1 19971211; AT 211249 T 20020115; CA 2228142 A1 19971211; CA 2228142 C 20060822; CH 691827 A5 20011031; DE 59705878 D1 20020131; DK 0843802 T3 20020325; EP 0843802 A1 19980527; EP 0843802 B1 20011219; JP 3687681 B2 20050824; JP H11510590 A 19990914; KR 100452561 B1 20050224; KR 20030039379 A 20030522; PL 183243 B1 20020628; PL 324803 A1 19980622; US 5983519 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100521

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100521

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100522

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100521

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100521

2011-01-17 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-03-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705878 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211249 T 20020115

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000410

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980124

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE