Global Patent Index - EP 0843975 B1

EP 0843975 B1 2001-04-04 - Device for preventing heat radiation to be visible from outside

Title (en)

Device for preventing heat radiation to be visible from outside

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Verhinderung einer von aussen sichtbar zu machenden Wärmestrahlung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour empêcher un rayonnement de chaleur d'être visible à l'extérieur

Publication

EP 0843975 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890173 A

Priority

  • EP 96890173 A
  • AT 200191 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0843975A1] The appliance comprises a protective suit (1,2,3) enclosing the wearer's body, and ventilated by a ventilator. The exterior of the ventilated area (9) is covered by a thermally insulated layer (10). Perforated tubing is contained in the ventilated area. which consists of two flexible layers of material (11,12) held apart by spacer-arms (13). A hood (3) with connection to the ventilator has a transparent, preferably perforated pane (6) over the face area. Gloves have a thermally insulated layer over the back of the hands, and are permeable to air on the palms-side. The fan driven by an electric motor is contained in a small, portable container (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/002 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/0025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0843975 A1 19980527; EP 0843975 B1 20010404; AT 402858 B 19970925; AT A200191 A 19970115

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606729 20010510

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000721

1999-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI SE

1999-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971110

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE