Global patent index - EP 0844033 A3

EP 0844033 A3 2000-04-05 - Bending machine with at least two bending functions

Title (en)

Bending machine with at least two bending functions

Title (de)

Biegemaschine mit mindestens zwei Biegefunktionen

Title (fr)

Machine à plier avec au moins deux fonctions de pliage

Publication

EP 0844033 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97120404 A

Priority

  • DE 29620263 U
  • DE 29714487 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844033A2] The bending machine (1) has a drive system (6). It has two separate bending heads which have workpiece support rollers (20,21) and at least one bending head is movable in a longitudinal direction. The travelling bending head (2) has circular or segmental formers (4a-4c,5), and pivots about an axis (40) fixed to the fixed bending head (3) which has peg-type formers (11). Flexible leads (14,15) and quick-release couplings (8,13,17), transmit control signals and hydraulic or pneumatic power from the control unit (7) and power unit to the bending heads. The fixed bender has a chuck (30) mounted on a sliding track (35), so that the rotational and linear fed position of a workpiece (31) can be adjusted. The power unit can be located on either bender.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 7/08; B21D 9/07; B21D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/00 (2006.01); B21D 7/06 (2006.01); B21D 7/08 (2006.01); B21D 9/00 (2006.01); B21D 9/08 (2006.01); B21D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 9/00 (2013.01); B21D 7/00 (2013.01); B21D 7/06 (2013.01); B21D 7/08 (2013.01); B21D 9/08 (2013.01); B21D 9/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 29519048 U1 19960125 - RASI MASCHINENBAU U HANDELS GM [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844033 A2 19980527; EP 0844033 A3 20000405; EP 0844033 B1 20030416

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051121

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031121

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031014

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59709846

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020424

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21D 7/08 A, 7B 21D 9/10 B, 7B 21D 9/07 B

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI