Global Patent Index - EP 0844100 B1

EP 0844100 B1 2001-05-30 - Blanket for offset printing

Title (en)

Blanket for offset printing

Title (de)

Drucktuch für Offsetdruck

Title (fr)

Blanchet d'impression offset

Publication

EP 0844100 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97120396 A

Priority

DE 19648494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844100A2] The continuously-produced offset lithographic printing cloth comprises a lithographic surface (6), compressive or resilient layer (3) and reinforcing layer (1) of low expansibility. There is a fabric layer (2) on the back of the reinforcement. The compressive layer is located between the lithographic surface and the reinforcing layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 10/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 10/04 (2013.01); B41N 2210/04 (2013.01); B41N 2210/06 (2013.01); B41N 2210/14 (2013.01); Y10S 428/909 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844100 A2 19980527; EP 0844100 A3 19980909; EP 0844100 B1 20010530; AT 201631 T 20010615; DE 19648494 A1 19980604; DE 19648494 C2 20020307; JP 4104194 B2 20080618; JP H10297133 A 19981110; US 6019042 A 20000201

INPADOC legal status


2017-12-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171119

2017-11-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703667

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111120

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201631 T

- Effective date: 20111120

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOVURANIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NOVURANIA S.P.A.

- Free text: NOVURANIA S.P.A.#VIA CIRCONVALLAZIONE, 3#38079 TIONE DI TRENTE (IT) -TRANSFER TO- NOVURANIA S.P.A.#VIA CIRCONVALLAZIONE, 3#38079 TIONE DI TRENTE (IT)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703667 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990222

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201631 T 20010615

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991018

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-05-26 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990222

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990222

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI