Global Patent Index - EP 0844159 B1

EP 0844159 B1 2001-12-19 - Frame for a bogie with a tilting device and a cross bearer, and bogie with such a frame

Title (en)

Frame for a bogie with a tilting device and a cross bearer, and bogie with such a frame

Title (de)

Drehgestellrahmen mit einer Neigungsvorrichtung und einer Neigetraverse, sowie Drehgestell mit einem solchen Rahmen

Title (fr)

Châssis de bogie muni d'un dispositif de pendulation à bielles et d'une traverse d'inclinaison, et bogie muni d'un tel châssis

Publication

EP 0844159 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402742 A

Priority

FR 9614370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844159A1] The system has levers (2) and a tilting cross-member (3) which is suspended from the bogie chassis (4) by the levers and has secondary suspension elements (5) between the tilting cross-member and the carriage body. The levers, cross-member and the bogie chassis form a trapezium of rigid articulated members in the radial plane, the smaller base of which is fixed to the cross-member and the larger base to the chassis, while the sides are formed by the levers. The bogie chassis has intermediate cross-members (9) which form, together with the levers and the tilting cross-member, an assembly which creates a predetermined angular rigidity between the bogie chassis and the carriage body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/22 (2006.01); B61F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844159 A1 19980527; EP 0844159 B1 20011219; AT 211091 T 20020115; BR 9705830 A 19990309; CA 2220025 A1 19980525; CA 2220025 C 20040203; CZ 290264 B6 20020612; CZ 9703728 A3 19980812; DE 69709299 D1 20020131; DE 69709299 T2 20020808; DK 0844159 T3 20020415; ES 2166962 T3 20020501; FR 2756241 A1 19980529; FR 2756241 B1 20031114; HU 9702229 A2 19991129; HU 9702229 A3 20020628; HU 9702229 D0 19980128; JP H10167063 A 19980623; MX 9709037 A 19980830; PL 188629 B1 20050331; PL 323273 A1 19980608; PT 844159 E 20020628; US 5970883 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 211091 T

- Effective date: 20171117

2017-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-11-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69709299

2017-09-28 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA

- Effective date: 20170928

2017-09-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, LEVALLOIS-PERRET, FR

- Document: DE 69709299

2017-09-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69709299

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE , CH

2015-06-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69709299

2015-06-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69709299

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2015-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

2015-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101118

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110517

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-07-11 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-05-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110517

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20091106

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166962 T3

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709299 20020131

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211091 T 20020115

2001-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FRAME FOR A BOGIE WITH A TILTING DEVICE AND A CROSS BEARER, AND BOGIE WITH SUCH A FRAME

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000609

1999-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI NL PT SE

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981021

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI NL PT SE

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI