Global Patent Index - EP 0844175 B1

EP 0844175 B1 2000-01-19 - AUTONOMOUS SACKING MACHINE

Title (en)

AUTONOMOUS SACKING MACHINE

Title (de)

SELBSTÄNDIG ARBEITENDE AUFSACKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE AUTONOME D'ENSACHAGE

Publication

EP 0844175 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97918163 A

Priority

  • ES 9700117 W
  • ES 9601028 A
  • ES 9601030 A
  • ES 9601034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742077A1] One of the improvements consists in setting up between the sack forming station (1) and the sack filling station (3) an intermediary station (2) at a distance from the sack filling station (3) substantially smaller than the distance existing between the filling station and the closing station (4) so that during the transfer of the sacks (8) by the carriage (9) said sacks arrive at the sack filling station (3) within a time substantially shorter than the time required for the transportation to the other stations, thus allowing a much longer time for the filling phase. Another improvement consists in providing a welding mechanism in order to reinforce the extremities of the sack after each has been filled and closed. Another improvement consists in providing the sacking machine with a sack conforming unit intended to break up the continuous tubular band from which said sacks are obtained and to close them by welding the lower extremity of each of the sacks, all of which being carried out in optimum conditions so that the sacks are capable of withstanding the filling phase coming immediately after.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/02 (2006.01); B65B 43/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/02 (2013.01); B65B 43/465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742077 A1 19971113; DE 69701180 D1 20000224; DE 69701180 T2 20000914; EP 0844175 A1 19980527; EP 0844175 B1 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070508

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701180

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990208

1999-03-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980205

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT