Global patent index - EP 0844203 B1

EP 0844203 B1 2000-08-02 - Device for removing sheets from a pile and for transporting the sheets away from the pile

Title (en)

Device for removing sheets from a pile and for transporting the sheets away from the pile

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abnahme von Bogen von einem Stapel und zum Transport der Bogen weg vom Stapel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever des feuilles d'une pile et pour transporter les feuilles loin de la pile

Publication

EP 0844203 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117801 A

Priority

DE 19648742 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844203A2] An apparatus for sheet (21) removal and transport from a stack (22) has an endless perforated toothed belt (1) circulating about a return wheel (8) and a suction wheel (7), the latter having vacuum connection line (14) openings which align with the perforation in the belt. The novelty is that (a) engagement of the teeth of the belt and the suction wheel is ensured by two toothed rings which extend from the peripheral edges of the suction wheel towards a central ridge which forms a peripheral guide path with the vacuum connection line openings; (b) only the belt edges, in the region of the suction wheel toothed rings, are provided with teeth in the form of two toothed rings separated by a guide face, which contacts the guide path of the suction wheel, so that the belt perforations align with the vacuum connection line openings; (c) the perforations are located in grooves which correspond to the tooth spacing and which are formed in a friction material layer on the belt side opposite its toothed side; and (d) a guide block (11) is positioned immediately after the suction wheel in the belt travel direction and has a guide path (23) for contacting the guide face of the belt. Preferably, the friction material layer consists of polyurethane or rubber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844203 A2 19980527; EP 0844203 A3 19981223; EP 0844203 B1 20000802; DE 19648742 A1 19980528; DE 19648742 C2 19990624

INPADOC legal status

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121014

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121014

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121014

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2002-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1999-10-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCHINENBAU OPPENWEILER BINDER GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR GB IT

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990625

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990223

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-09-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCHINENBAU OPPENWEILER BINDER GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI