Global Patent Index - EP 0844312 B1

EP 0844312 B1 2000-05-31 - STAINLESS STEELS EXCELLENT IN THERMAL NEUTRON ABSORPTION

Title (en)

STAINLESS STEELS EXCELLENT IN THERMAL NEUTRON ABSORPTION

Title (de)

ROSTFREIER STAHL MIT HERVORRAGENDEN THERMISCH-NEUTRONEN-ADSORBTIONSEIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

ACIERS INOXYDABLES PARTICULIEREMENT UTILES POUR L'ABSORPTION DE NEUTRONS THERMIQUES

Publication

EP 0844312 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96926611 A

Priority

  • JP 9602258 W
  • JP 20323095 A
  • JP 27216495 A
  • US 98468997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844312A1] The ferritic stainless steel of the present invention contain the following main chemical elements, in which a relationship between B and Gd, preferably, satisfies the following equation (1) on the weight % basis: <TABLE> The austenitic stainless steel of the present invention contain the following main chemical elements, in which a relationship between B and Gd, preferably, satisfies the following equation (1) on the weight % basis: <TABLE> The stainless steel of the present invention described above are excellent in thermal neutron absorption ability, as well as are excellent in the workability such as hot workability and cold workability, and the corrosion resistance, particularly, the corrosion resistance for HAZ and are inexpensive for the manufacturing cost. Further, since the toughness, the weldability and the like are also satisfactory, they are extremely suitable to materials for use in nuclear fuel casks or the like: <MATH> in which <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/32; G21F 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/32 (2006.01); C22C 38/54 (2006.01); G21F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/32 (2013.01); C22C 38/54 (2013.01); G21F 1/08 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/103 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/10 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844312 A1 19980527; EP 0844312 A4 19981223; EP 0844312 B1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100808

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69608688

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100808

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090805

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608688

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990812

1998-12-30 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: C22C 38/32

1998-12-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980210

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB