Global Patent Index - EP 0844336 A3

EP 0844336 A3 2001-03-07 - Bollards

Title (en)

Bollards

Title (de)

Pollern

Title (fr)

Bornes

Publication

EP 0844336 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97309361 A

Priority

  • GB 9624405 A
  • GB 9624406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844336A2] A bollard 10, particularly for preventing vehicular access therepast, has a body 12 fixed at 14 to the ground G. The body 12 is shaped to deflect a vehicle impacting thereon, thus deflecting a direct collision to mitigate the force of the impact on the bollard 10. Another embodiment is described which is a removable bollard. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/00; E01F 9/011; E01F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E01F 9/013 (2006.01); E01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/12 (2013.01); E01F 9/677 (2016.02); E01F 9/681 (2016.02); E01F 9/685 (2016.02); E01F 15/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844336 A2 19980527; EP 0844336 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2002-01-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01F 15/00 A, 7E 01F 9/011 B, 7E 01F 15/04 B

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI