Global Patent Index - EP 0844342 A3

EP 0844342 A3 2000-10-18 - Profile for walls or ceilings to be used for all dry constructions

Title (en)

Profile for walls or ceilings to be used for all dry constructions

Title (de)

Decken- und Wandprofil zur universellen Verwendung im Trockenbau

Title (fr)

Profilé pour murs et plafonds à utiliser pour toutes constructions à sec

Publication

EP 0844342 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97111215 A

Priority

DE 19646857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844342A2] The sides (10) of the profile are made from thin sheet metal of various shapes and sizes that are bent into a U-shape. There are cut-out sections (9,11) at either set or regular distances in the sides and/or base (8) of the profile. The size of these cut-out sections depends upon the predetermined purpose of the profile. The desired shape and stability is achieved either through bends or additional strips of metal fixed firmly to the base.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 9/06; E04B 2/78; E04F 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/78 (2006.01); E04B 9/06 (2006.01); E04F 19/02 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/065 (2013.01); E04B 2/789 (2013.01); E04B 9/061 (2013.01); E04F 19/02 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7481 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19646857 A1 19980520; EP 0844342 A2 19980527; EP 0844342 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020717

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 9/06 A, 7E 04B 2/78 B, 7E 04F 19/02 B

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI