Global Patent Index - EP 0844346 A3

EP 0844346 A3 2000-04-19 - Coupling device for rotary drive

Title (en)

Coupling device for rotary drive

Title (de)

Kupplungsvorrichtung einer Drehmitnahme

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accouplement d'entraînement rotatif

Publication

EP 0844346 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97117029 A

Priority

DE 19648146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844346A2] A rotary part (8) has a multiple-cornered hole into which the multiple-cornered bar fits. The rotary part has a central part (14) possessing the multiple-corned hole, and a carrier part (15) radially adjacent to the central part. A coupling slide-piece (21), mounted on the central part, fits into the carrier part and has a control part (24) protruding into the hole, when in a catch-position. The coupling slide piece can be radially displaced in relation to the rotary part's rotational axis. The coupling slide piece has a protruding catch (28) fitting into a recess (29) in a catch-position

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 13/005 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0016 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0017 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0026 (2013.01); E05D 15/52 (2013.01); E05F 15/63 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/216 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/68 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844346 A2 19980527; EP 0844346 A3 20000419; EP 0844346 B1 20011128; AT 209744 T 20011215; DE 19648146 C1 19980618

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705535

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 209744 T

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110902

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101007

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-05-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705535 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209744 T 20011215

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI