Global patent index - EP 0844438 B1

EP 0844438 B1 2000-08-09 - Grate for a furnace

Title (en)

Grate for a furnace

Title (de)

Rost für eine Feuerungsanlage

Title (fr)

Grille pour un foyer

Publication

EP 0844438 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810815 A

Priority

DE 19648128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844438A2] The fixed and movable bedding layer units in rows are confined by side walls. Each unit (11,12,13) consists of supply and discharge pipes (15,16) and cooling ducts. Adjacent units swivel and are restricted by a support. The cooling ducts are positioned across the grid and are arranged sinusoidally in the form of pipes (9) between which are openings for the entry of primary air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 11/18 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23H 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844438 A2 19980527; EP 0844438 A3 19990609; EP 0844438 B1 20000809; AT 195368 T 20000815; CZ 291145 B6 20021211; CZ 9703557 A3 19980617; DE 19648128 A1 19980528; DE 19648128 C2 20021107; DK 0844438 T3 20001227; ES 2151235 T3 20001216; JP 2941753 B2 19990830; JP H10160150 A 19980619; NO 310378 B1 20010625; NO 975175 A 19980522; NO 975175 D0 19971111; US 5913274 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-03-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-10-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-11-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-08-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2002-07-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2002-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG TRANSFER- ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2001-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-01-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-12-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151235

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG TRANSFER- ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-11-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702139

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195368

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990531

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980302

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI