Global Patent Index - EP 0844447 A3

EP 0844447 A3 2000-04-12 - Method for producing a heat exchanger for a refrigeration apparatus and heat exchanger produced therewith

Title (en)

Method for producing a heat exchanger for a refrigeration apparatus and heat exchanger produced therewith

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wärmetauschers und damit hergestellter Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un échangeur de chaleur et échangeur ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 0844447 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97118032 A

Priority

IT PN960065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844447A2] The invention relates to a method for producing a heat exchanger for household-type and similar refrigeration appliances, said heat exchanger being manufactured starting from a coil-like bent pipe (10) and at least a plate (51), wherein said pipe and said plate are preferably made of an iron alloy. Along at least one (15) of the substantially rectilinear sections (21) of the coil, the pipe (10) is torsionally deformed beyond the limit of elasticity of the material of which it is made. The therewith associated plate (51) is at the same time bent at right angle. The invention also relates to a heat exchanger produced according to such a method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/02; B23P 15/26; F28F 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/08 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/08 (2013.01); F25B 39/02 (2013.01); F28F 1/22 (2013.01); F25B 2339/023 (2013.01); F28F 2210/10 (2013.01); F28F 2275/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844447 A2 19980527; EP 0844447 A3 20000412; IT 1289400 B1 19981002; IT PN960065 A1 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020221

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI