Global Patent Index - EP 0844633 B1

EP 0844633 B1 2001-03-14 - Device with end position switches for an electric motor-driven venetian blind

Title (en)

Device with end position switches for an electric motor-driven venetian blind

Title (de)

Endlagenschaltvorrichtung einer elektromotorisch angetriebenen Jalousie

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation de fin de course pour un store à lamelles

Publication

EP 0844633 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97440117 A

Priority

DE 19648825 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844633A2] The end position switch has at least one pair of control cam discs (7), rotated by the electric drive motor for operation of the blind, with a switching cam (8) cooperating with a switch operating lever (10) for a microswitch (6). Each control cam disc has a recess (12) with a rebated edge (13) extending over part of its periphery, cooperating with a blocking slider (15) having an arm (18) for operation of the microswitch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/18; E06B 9/70; E06B 9/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/18 (2006.01); H01H 19/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/183 (2013.01); H01H 19/623 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844633 A2 19980527; EP 0844633 A3 19990428; EP 0844633 B1 20010314; DE 19648825 A1 19980528

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-06-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-16 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703134 20010419

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990911

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1999-02-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI