EP 0844683 A1 19980527 - Microstrip circuits
Title (en)
Microstrip circuits
Title (de)
Mikrostreifenkreise
Title (fr)
Circuits à microbande
Publication
Application
Priority
GB 9624477 A 19961123
Abstract (en)
A means of terminating a microstrip transmission line (1) comprises a microwave diode (4) employed as a matched load. The matching characteristics of the diode (4) can be optimised by varying a bias current from a supply (6). This method of optimising load performance lends itself to automation with computer controlled test equipment. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01P 1/24 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01P 1/24 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 5298793 A 19940329 - KOTANI JUTARO [JP], et al
- [X] US 4301429 A 19811117 - GOLDMAN MARK B, et al
- [A] US 4301432 A 19811117 - CARLSON RICHARD L, et al
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 103 (E - 244)<1540> 15 May 1984 (1984-05-15)
- [A] PEKET-MAY M ET AL: "FD-TD MODELING OF DIGITAL SIGNAL PROPAGATION IN 3-D CIRCUITS WITH PASSIVE AND ACTIVE LOADS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, vol. 42, no. 8, 1 August 1994 (1994-08-01), pages 1514 - 1523, XP000456911
- [A] M.C.R. CARVALHO ET AL.: "FLAT MICROWAVE RESPONSES OF DIRECTLY MODULATED LASER DIODES", 1986 IEEE-MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM-DIGEST, 2 June 1986 (1986-06-02) - 4 June 1986 (1986-06-04), BALTIMORE (US), pages 523 - 526, XP002056128
Designated contracting state (EPC)
CH DE FR GB IT LI
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 97203985 A 19971121; GB 9624477 A 19961123