Global Patent Index - EP 0844687 B1

EP 0844687 B1 2001-05-16 - Electrical connection of two high-voltage plastic cables and a method of making such a connection

Title (en)

Electrical connection of two high-voltage plastic cables and a method of making such a connection

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbindung von zwei kunststoffisolierten Hochspannungskabeln und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer solchen Verbindung

Title (fr)

Connexion électrique de deux câbles haute-tension à isolation plastique et procédé de fabrication d'une telle connexion

Publication

EP 0844687 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96402528 A

Priority

EP 96402528 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0844687A1] The two cables to be connected are stripped at their ends and their electric conductors are connected to each other. A pre-manufactured connection muff is arranged over the connection point of the electric conductors (11,13). The latter (11,13) are connected together by means of a press sleeve (15). A tubular matrix (21) with several through-bores (33) is arranged over the sleeve (15) to press the latter to the leads (11,13). At least two points in the matrix (21) four or six through-bores (33) are preferably evenly distributed about their circumference. The matrix (21) may be divided in its longitudinal direction. The press sleeve (15) may be centred relative to the electric conductors (11,13) by the matrix (21). The outer diameter of the matrix is preferably as large as the diameter of the insulation of the two cables (3,5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/20; H01R 43/058

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/20 (2006.01); H01R 43/058 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/20 (2013.01); H01R 43/0585 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0844687 A1 19980527; EP 0844687 B1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEXANS

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061125

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061125

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061126

2006-01-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2002-11-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Free text: 20010516 *NEXANS:16 RUE DE MONCEAU, 75008 PARIS

2001-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Free text: 20010516 *NEXANS

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NEXANS

2001-09-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-09-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NEXANS

2001-08-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NEXANS

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990818

1999-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970906

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE