Global patent index - EP 0845028 B1

EP 0845028 B1 2000-01-05 - METHOD OF PRODUCING AN AMORPHOUS ALKALI SILICATE FOLLOWED BY IMPREGNATION

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING AN AMORPHOUS ALKALI SILICATE FOLLOWED BY IMPREGNATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AMORPHEN ALKALISILIKATS MIT IMPRÄGNIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN SILICATE ALCALIN AMORPHE SOUMIS A UNE IMPREGNATION

Publication

EP 0845028 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96928415 A

Priority

  • DE 19529908 A
  • EP 9603466 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19529908A1] The object of the invention is to produce spray-dried amorphous silicates and impregnate them with detergent and cleaning agent constituents which are liquid to waxy in conventional processing conditions, without substantially impairing pourability. This object is achieved in that: a) an aqueous preparation substantially containing as active substance an amorphous alkali silicate, having an M2O : SiO2 (M = alkali metal) molar composition of between 1:1.5 and 1:3.3, is spray-dried and subsequently; b) impregnated with an aqueous dispersion of washing and cleaning agent constituents, one constituent of this dispersion being an organic co-builder; and c) is optionally dried.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/08; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 33/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529908 A1 19970220; AT 188505 T 20000115; EP 0845028 A1 19980603; EP 0845028 B1 20000105; ES 2142603 T3 20000416; HU 9802376 A2 19990128; HU 9802376 A3 20001128; JP H11510844 A 19990921; PL 324634 A1 19980608; WO 9707194 A1 19970227

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59604128

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070813

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010806

2002-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-09-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-08-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000831

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-08-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000802

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142603

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604128

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188505

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990317

1998-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARTIGA GONZALEZ, RENE-ANDRES

1998-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAUER, VOLKER

1998-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BURMEISTER, KATRIN

1998-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GREGER, MANFRED

1998-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANDKUEHLER, PETER

1998-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNEPP, KATHRIN

1998-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WICHE, ADOLF

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980206

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL