Global patent index - EP 0845060 B1

EP 0845060 B1 2000-11-02 - METHODS FOR SIZING PAPER

Title (en)

METHODS FOR SIZING PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PAPIERLEIMUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE COLLAGE DU PAPIER

Publication

EP 0845060 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96928510 A

Priority

  • GB 9602012 W
  • GB 9516766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707282A1] The present invention relates to methods and compositions for sizing paper. In particular, the invention relates to a method of sizing paper comprising the steps of a) contacting said paper or a constituent of said paper with a protein capable of binding to said paper or said constituent of paper; and b) denaturing or heating said protein bound to said paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/22; D21H 21/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 11/12 (2006.01); D21H 17/22 (2006.01); D21H 21/14 (2006.01); D21H 21/16 (2006.01); D21H 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/14 (2013.01); D21H 17/22 (2013.01); D21H 21/16 (2013.01); D21H 17/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707282 A1 19970227; AU 6750296 A 19970312; AU 6824896 A 19970312; BR 9610219 A 19990615; BR 9610327 A 20050906; CA 2229358 A1 19970227; CA 2229588 A1 19970227; CN 1199421 A 19981118; CN 1199439 A 19981118; DE 69610841 D1 20001207; DE 69610841 T2 20010301; EP 0845031 A1 19980603; EP 0845060 A1 19980603; EP 0845060 B1 20001102; GB 9516766 D0 19951018; JP H11510701 A 19990921; JP H11510861 A 19990921; PT 845060 E 20010330; WO 9707203 A1 19970227

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010816

2002-04-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-08-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-03-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610841

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB PT SE

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHODS FOR SIZING PAPER

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981012

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980213

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB PT SE