Global Patent Index - EP 0845098 B1

EP 0845098 B1 2001-03-21 - ASYMMETRIC PENETRATION WARHEAD

Title (en)

ASYMMETRIC PENETRATION WARHEAD

Title (de)

ASYMMETRISCHES PENETRATORGESCHOSS

Title (fr)

TETE EXPLOSIVE DE PENETRATION ASYMETRIQUE

Publication

EP 0845098 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96927859 A

Priority

  • IL 9600086 W
  • IL 11497395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0760458A1] The penetration warhead (14) for use in a position-controlled roll-stabilized missile (10) includes a nose section which is asymmetric with respect to the main axis of the warhead <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/06; F42B 30/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/06 (2006.01); F42B 30/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/06 (2013.01); F42B 30/08 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4637313 A 19870120 - HENDERSON DAVID [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0760458 A1 19970305; EP 0760458 B1 20001220; AT 199978 T 20010415; AU 6753796 A 19970312; BR 9610411 A 19991221; DE 69611273 D1 20010125; DE 69611273 T2 20010809; EP 0845098 A2 19980603; EP 0845098 A4 19990407; EP 0845098 B1 20010321; ES 2155196 T3 20010501; IL 114973 A 20000726; IL 114973 D0 19960618; WO 9707379 A2 19970227; WO 9707379 A3 19970522

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030818

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030817

2002-08-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020702

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: STATE OF ISRAEL MINISTRY OF DEFENCE RAFAEL ARMAMEN

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-06-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155196 T3

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES GR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199978 T 20010415

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-04-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990222

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES GR IT LI NL PT SE

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980216

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES GR IT LI NL PT SE