Global Patent Index - EP 0845196 B1

EP 0845196 B1 2002-11-27 - GALETTE FOR HEATING A RUNNING SYNTHETIC THREAD

Title (en)

GALETTE FOR HEATING A RUNNING SYNTHETIC THREAD

Title (de)

GALETTE ZUM ERHITZEN EINES LAUFENDEN SYNTHETISCHEN FADENS

Title (fr)

GALETTE POUR CHAUFFER UN FIL SYNTHETIQUE CONTINU

Publication

EP 0845196 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928210 A

Priority

  • DE 19624266 A
  • EP 9703121 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749265A1] The object of the invention is a galette for heating a running synthetic thread having a plurality of fixed primary windings and a magnetically conductive galette casing rotatable in relation thereto. The galette casing is coupled to the primary windings via shanks of the primary winding supports, arranged therebetween, over a defined radial gap for generating induced currents. The supports are designed in such a way that their transformer sheets are radially superimposed in the region of the groove base, so that the magnetic flux is screened outwards, especially towards the coil supports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/14; D02J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/00 (2006.01); H05B 6/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/145 (2013.01); D02J 13/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9749265 A1 19971224; CN 1135908 C 20040121; CN 1196864 A 19981021; EP 0845196 A1 19980603; EP 0845196 B1 20021127; EP 0845196 B2 20110706; KR 100446346 B1 20041014; TW 354339 B 19990311; US 5970592 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708815

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708815

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-25 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59708815

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2011-07-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-07-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2004-04-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DIENES APPARATEBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HERMANN KAHLHOEFER

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708815 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980219

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI