Global Patent Index - EP 0845231 A3

EP 0845231 A3 2000-02-23 - Bed base with multiple sections, particularly for a hospital bed

Title (en)

Bed base with multiple sections, particularly for a hospital bed

Title (de)

Mehrteiliger Betteinsatz, insbesondere für ein Krankenbett

Title (fr)

Sommier à plusieurs parties, notamment pour lit de malade

Publication

EP 0845231 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97890226 A

Priority

AT 205596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845231A2] At least one pair of link arms (31, 32) are provided, which are linked on the one hand to the frame (20) of the insert (2) or to the bed frame and on the other hand to the head part (21) of the insert. The head part of the insert is pivotable in a translatory movement into different inclined positions. Two pairs of link arms are provided (31, 32), which are located on a longitudinal rail of the insert (2) or on a longitudinal beam of the bed frame (1). On the two longitudinal rails of the frame (20) of the insert (2) or on the two longitudinal beams of the bed frame downwardly projecting extensions (26) are provided, to which the two link arms (31, 32) are connected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845231 A2 19980603; EP 0845231 A3 20000223; AT 407213 B 20010125; AT A205596 A 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI SE

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI SE

1998-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI