Global Patent Index - EP 0845237 B1

EP 0845237 B1 2000-04-05 - Vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur

Publication

EP 0845237 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96119228 A

Priority

EP 96119228 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845237A1] A vacuum cleaner includes an optical dust sensor (3) for detecting a quantity of dust which sensor is provided at a predetermined position of a suction path (73) for sucking air by a suction force of the vacuum cleaner, an output signal is supplied to a display device (2) so that a display corresponding to the quantity of the sucked dust, which signal is output from the optical dust sensor and is varied in stageless condition corresponding to the quantity of the dust. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/2894 (2013.01); A47L 9/2815 (2013.01); A47L 9/2857 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845237 A1 19980603; EP 0845237 B1 20000405; DE 69607629 D1 20000511; DE 69607629 T2 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011129

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001116

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607629 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980818

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980713

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB