Global Patent Index - EP 0845482 B1

EP 0845482 B1 2000-02-02 - Process for producing fluorine-containing elastomer

Title (en)

Process for producing fluorine-containing elastomer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Fluor-haltigen Elastomers

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la production d'un elastomère fluoré

Publication

EP 0845482 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97120935 A

Priority

JP 33305096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845482A1] A peroxide-vulcanizable fluorine-containing elastomer containing iodines as cross-linking sites, capable of producing vulcanization products having a distinguished heat resistance is produced by polymerization reaction of a fluorinated olefin having 2 to 8 carbon atoms in the presence of a diiodide compound represented by the following general formula: I-R-I where R is a divalent fluorohydrocarbon group, chlorofluorohydrocarbon group or hydrocarbon group, having 2 to 8 carbon atoms, respectively, and 2,2-difluoroiodoethylene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 214/18; C08F 214/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 2/00 (2006.01); C08F 214/18 (2006.01); C08F 214/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 214/22 (2013.01); C08F 214/184 (2013.01); C08F 2438/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845482 A1 19980603; EP 0845482 B1 20000202; CN 1138797 C 20040218; CN 1186814 A 19980708; CN 1228379 C 20051123; CN 1431248 A 20030723; DE 69701251 D1 20000309; DE 69701251 T2 20000621; US 5898054 A 19990427

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091128

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701251 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990115

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980615

1998-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SAITO, SATORU

1998-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAWASAKI, KUNIYOSHI

1998-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TATSU, HARUYOSHI

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI