Global patent index - EP 0845532 A3

EP 0845532 A3 2000-01-05 - Enzymes for the synthesis of coniferyl alcohol, coniferyl aldehyde, ferulic acid, vanillin, vanillic acid and their applications

Title (en)

Enzymes for the synthesis of coniferyl alcohol, coniferyl aldehyde, ferulic acid, vanillin, vanillic acid and their applications

Title (de)

Syntheseenzyme für die Herstellung von Coniferylalkohol, Coniferylaldehyd, Ferulasäure, Vanillin und Vanillinsäure und deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Enzymes pour la production de coniférylalcool, coniférylaldéhyde, l'acide férilique, vanilline et l'acide vanillique et leur applications

Publication

EP 0845532 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97120058 A

Priority

DE 19649655 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845532A2] Enzymes for the synthesis of coniferyl alcohol, coniferyl aldehyde, ferulic acid, vanillin and vanillic acid from eugenol are new. Also claimed are: (i) DNA (I) coding for the enzymes; cosmid clones and vectors containing (I); and microorganisms transformed with (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/53; C12N 9/02; C12N 9/80; C12P 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 9/04 (2006.01); C12N 9/80 (2006.01); C12N 15/53 (2006.01); C12N 15/60 (2006.01); C12P 7/22 (2006.01); C12P 7/40 (2006.01); C12R 1/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0083 (2013.01); C12N 9/0004 (2013.01); C12N 9/80 (2013.01); C12P 7/22 (2013.01); Y02P 20/52 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845532 A2 19980603; EP 0845532 A3 20000105; DE 19649655 A1 19980604; JP H10155496 A 19980616; US 2002182697 A1 20021205; US 2003228670 A1 20031211; US 6524831 B2 20030225

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-01-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: ENZYMES FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF CONIFERYL ALDEHYDE AND THEIR APPLICATIONS

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL