Global Patent Index - EP 0845568 B1

EP 0845568 B1 2001-03-28 - Lift-off hinge for vehicle doors

Title (en)

Lift-off hinge for vehicle doors

Title (de)

Aushängbares Türscharnier für Kraftwagentüren

Title (fr)

Charnière dégondable pour portes de véhicule

Publication

EP 0845568 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119297 A

Priority

  • DE 29620782 U
  • DE 19652625 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845568A2] The hinge comprises two hinge halves fixable to door arrangement, door or door column, each with two spaced apart aligned hinge eyelets. The two hinge halves (1, 2) are formed by a folded plate material section and at least in the area of the hinge axis have a U-shaped profile cross-section form. The hinge eyelets (3, 4) are arranged in the profile arms of the U-shaped profile cross-section form of the two hinge halves. The two hinge halves also have a device for their counterposed securing both in the closed and also in a further pivot position corresponding to the partially opened position of the door. The two hinge halves engage over one another with their profile base and the hinge pin stubs (11) are arranged in the hinge eyelets of the engaging hinge half.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/12; E05D 7/10; E05D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/105 (2013.01); E05D 11/1085 (2013.01); E05D 5/062 (2013.01); E05D 5/128 (2013.01); E05D 7/121 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53605 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5361 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845568 A2 19980603; EP 0845568 A3 20000119; EP 0845568 B1 20010328; ES 2156624 T3 20010701; US 6070296 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ED. SCHARWAECHTER GMBH, 42855 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59703228

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703228

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2005-11-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051105

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031213

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2002-11-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011106

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011012

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156624 T3

2001-06-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703228 20010503

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971105

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI