Global patent index - EP 0845582 B1

EP 0845582 B1 2000-04-05 - Valve control for an internal combustion engine provided with lift valves for the gas exchange

Title (en)

Valve control for an internal combustion engine provided with lift valves for the gas exchange

Title (de)

Ventilsteuerung für eine mit Hubventilen zum Ladungswechsel ausgerüstete Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape pour un moteur à combustion interne équipé de soupapes à levée pour le transfert de charge

Publication

EP 0845582 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117061 A

Priority

DE 19649584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845582A1] Each cylinder of the engine is fitted with at least two inlet valves and with at least two exhaust valves, driven by two parallel cams (9,10) which drive cam followers mounted between hydraulic supports and the ends of the valve stems. Alternate cylinders are in a V-formation with each cylinder having the cam axes between the axes of the valves and the axes of the hydraulic supports. The valve guides and hydraulic supports are on alternate sides of the cam axes on alternate cylinders. The valve guides and hydraulic supports are parallel to each other. The hydraulic supports are connected to the lubrication circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/053; F01L 1/24; F01L 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/053 (2006.01); F01L 1/24 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F01L 1/053 (2013.01); F01L 1/2405 (2013.01); F01L 1/26 (2013.01); F01L 2001/0537 (2013.01); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01); F02B 2275/20 (2013.01); F02F 1/4214 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845582 A1 19980603; EP 0845582 B1 20000405; CN 1085289 C 20020522; CN 1187577 A 19980715; ES 2146057 T3 20000716; JP H10184318 A 19980714; PT 845582 E 20000731; US 5996541 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-10-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59701398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120811

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031002

2004-07-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-10-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-10-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2002-10-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-14 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021014

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146057

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB PT SE

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB PT SE

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB PT SE

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981203

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB PT SE