Global Patent Index - EP 0845602 B1

EP 0845602 B1 2001-12-19 - Electrohydraulic control device

Title (en)

Electrohydraulic control device

Title (de)

Elektohydraulische Steuervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande electrohydraulique

Publication

EP 0845602 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118001 A

Priority

DE 19649833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845602A2] The device functions independently of electrical input signals to proportional magnets and has valve devices operating with 4-2 function. The valve devices for control of the volume flow coming from the positioning motor have a releasable seat valve and a slide valve for control of the backward-flowing volume flow. The control members of the seat and slide valves are arranged behind one another in a longitudinal bore of a housing, so that the slide valve is located between the seat valve and the proportional magnet. The seat valve (11) and the slide valve (12) have separated control members (22,45) which are in mechanical work connection with one another. A first adjustable device, by altering the tension of a regulating spring, adjusts one of the volume flow. A second adjustment device (53) is also provided, with which the other volume flow is adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/01; F15B 13/044

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01); F15B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2013.01); F15B 13/015 (2013.01); F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/0405 (2013.01); F15B 13/044 (2013.01); F15B 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845602 A2 19980603; EP 0845602 A3 19980715; EP 0845602 B1 20011219; DE 19649833 A1 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2004-12-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031017

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705881 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000928

1999-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990115

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT