Global Patent Index - EP 0845711 B1

EP 0845711 B1 2000-10-04 - Method for preparing a security document with a toner accepting layer

Title (en)

Method for preparing a security document with a toner accepting layer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung fälschungssicherer Dokumente mit einer tonerempfangenden Schicht

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication de documents de sécurité comprenant une couche réceptrice de révélateur

Publication

EP 0845711 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97203597 A

Priority

  • EP 97203597 A
  • EP 96119164 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845711A1] The present invention provides a method for preparing a security document comprising the step of printing with a laser printer on an imaging element comprising a support and a toner accepting layer, characterized in that said toner accepting layer is a layer comprising a copolymer of ethylene and acrylic acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); G03G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/004 (2013.01); B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B41M 7/0027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845711 A1 19980603; EP 0845711 B1 20001004

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051118

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2004-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-06 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2001-03-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703231 20001109

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981203

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB