Global Patent Index - EP 0845718 B1

EP 0845718 B1 2000-05-10 - Electric switching means on a printed circuit board and watch comprising such a switch

Title (en)

Electric switching means on a printed circuit board and watch comprising such a switch

Title (de)

Elektrische Schaltvorrichtung auf einer gedruckten Schaltung und Uhr, die eine solche Vorrichtung enthält

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'interrupteur électrique sur un circuit imprimé, et montre comportant un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0845718 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96119280 A

Priority

EP 96119280 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH10160869A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a switch device for a printed circuit which has a very simple and low cost structure, surely operates, requires only small space, and is capable of using in a small thing such as wrist watch especially. SOLUTION: This switch is provided with an elastic contact member 22 provided with a projection part 25 receiving pressure in the parallel direction A to a printed circuit from a push button 4. At least one bent leg part 28 of contact parts are fixed at the printed circuit or its close position. At the end part of another leg part 26 of the contact member 22, a contact part 27 is formed, which lowers on the pad of the circuit when the contact member 22 is bent by receiving the working pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 3/00; H01H 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04G 21/00 (2010.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01H 13/14 (2006.01); H05K 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/001 (2013.01); H01H 1/5805 (2013.01); H01H 2001/5811 (2013.01); H01H 2300/016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845718 A1 19980603; EP 0845718 B1 20000510; AT 192858 T 20000515; CN 1076512 C 20011219; CN 1188974 A 19980729; DE 69608286 D1 20000615; DE 69608286 T2 20010104; HK 1015070 A1 20020726; JP 4351302 B2 20091028; JP H10160869 A 19980619; SG 67445 A1 19990921; US 5774427 A 19980630

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608286

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-12-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-12-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-11-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608286 20000615

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192858 T 20000515

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990707

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981203

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE