Global Patent Index - EP 0845729 B1

EP 0845729 B1 2001-03-07 - Control unit for gas distribution and bottle provided with such unit

Title (en)

Control unit for gas distribution and bottle provided with such unit

Title (de)

Steuereinheit für Gasverteilung und mit einer solchen Einheit ausgestattete Flasche

Title (fr)

Ensemble de commande de distrubution de gaz et bouteille de gaz équipée d'un tel ensemble

Publication

EP 0845729 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97403086 A

Priority

  • EP 94401216 A
  • FR 9306646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0629937A1] The control and gas-dispensing unit comprises a lower block (1), mounted on a gas bottle (4) and including a manometer (9) and a filling adapter (11), and on which is mounted permanently a sub-unit (32, 17) which can move axially in response to a rotation of a tubular control and actuation element (46) surrounding the sub-unit, which contains a reducer (27) and an indexable flow regulator (34, 35) and has a low-pressure outlet (45) and a mean-pressure outlet (51). Application in particular to the dispensing of medical oxygen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 16/10; F17C 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/00 (2006.01); F16K 1/30 (2006.01); F17C 13/04 (2006.01); G05D 16/06 (2006.01); G05D 16/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 1/305 (2013.01); F16K 1/307 (2013.01); F17C 13/04 (2013.01); G05D 7/0186 (2013.01); G05D 16/103 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0329 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0335 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0338 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0385 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0394 (2013.01); F17C 2221/011 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01); F17C 2250/043 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0626 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0636 (2013.01); F17C 2270/025 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0545 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7808 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7835 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87917 (2015.04); Y10T 137/88046 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0629937 A1 19941221; EP 0629937 B1 19980729; AT 169131 T 19980815; CA 2124897 A1 19941204; CN 1069393 C 20010808; CN 1118855 A 19960320; DE 69412003 D1 19980903; DE 69412003 T2 19981203; DE 69426838 D1 20010412; DE 69426838 T2 20010809; DK 0629937 T3 19981026; EP 0845729 A2 19980603; EP 0845729 A3 19981230; EP 0845729 B1 20010307; ES 2119979 T3 19981016; ES 2155662 T3 20010516; FR 2706051 A1 19941209; FR 2706051 B1 19950728; JP H07158800 A 19950620; US 5566713 A 19961022

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080603

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TAEMA

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070606

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-06-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-06-13 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-06-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-05-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-01-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020602

2002-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-06-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020602

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010517

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155662 T3

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426838 20010412

2001-04-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-03-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 629937

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991026

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990630

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

1998-06-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 629937

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE