Global Patent Index - EP 0845760 A3

EP 0845760 A3 2000-07-26 - Method for verifying the expected postage security device in a host system

Title (en)

Method for verifying the expected postage security device in a host system

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Überprüfen der erwarteten Frankiersicherheitsvorrichtung in einem Zentralrechnersystem

Title (fr)

Procédé pour vérifier le dispositif de sécurité d'affranchissement prévu dans un système de serveur

Publication

EP 0845760 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97120456 A

Priority

US 75457096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845760A2] A method to verify in a host system that the expected PSD is coupled to the host. The host system generates a message, such as a random number and sends to the PSD. In one embodiment, the random number is signed in the PSD. The signed number is transmitted to the host where the signature is verified. In an alternate embodiment, the PSD encrypts the number and transmits it to the host system. The host system decrypts the encrypted number and ensures it corresponds with the number originally generated and transmitted to the PSD. Methods for verifying in a PSD that the expected host is coupled to the PSD mirrors the two embodiments for verifying the expected PSD. The generated message may include data indicating status of the PSD based, for example a checksum of PSD transaction records stored in the host system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0075 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00758 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00766 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845760 A2 19980603; EP 0845760 A3 20000726; CA 2221670 A1 19980521

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI