Global patent index - EP 0845811 A3

EP 0845811 A3 2000-01-12 - A read only memory array and a method of manufacturing the array

Title (en)

A read only memory array and a method of manufacturing the array

Title (de)

Festwertspeicheranordnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Matrice de mémoire morte et procédé de fabrication associé

Publication

EP 0845811 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97120735 A

Priority

SG 1996011480 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845811A2] A compact ROM array is formed in a single active region (5) bounnded by field oxide regions, the array being formed of one or more ROM banks (6, 7). Each ROM bank has a plurality of pairs of N+ bit lines (1-1 to 4-2), a plurality of conductive word lines (15-1 to 16-2) formed on top of, and perpendicular to, the bit lines, and left-select (11) and right-select (12-1, 12-2) lines arranged parallel to the word lines to enable particular transistor cells in the array to be selected to be read. The transistor cells (40, 41) are formed by adjacent portions of adjacent bit lines together with the portion of the word line extending between them. Isolation regions (43) between the transistor cells are formed by implanting the substrate between them with Boron dopant of a low energy and concentration after the bit and word lines have been fabricated and the transistor cells are programmed by implanting a channel region (42) with Boron of a higher energy and concentration after the low energy implantation step. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 27/112; H01L 21/8246

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/8246 (2006.01); H01L 27/112 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/1126 (2013.01); H01L 27/112 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0845811 A2 19980603; EP 0845811 A3 20000112; JP H10163347 A 19980619; SG 64409 A1 19990427; TW 317021 B 19971001; US 5929494 A 19990727; US 6133100 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2001-01-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20001023

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI