Global Patent Index - EP 0845927 B1

EP 0845927 B1 2002-11-27 - Circuit for operating low pressure discharge lamps with a low voltage source

Title (en)

Circuit for operating low pressure discharge lamps with a low voltage source

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb einer Niederdruckentladungslampe an einer Niedervolt-Spannungsquelle

Title (fr)

Circuit pour alimenter une lampe à décharge basse pression par une source à basse tension

Publication

EP 0845927 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115534 A

Priority

DE 19649170 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0845927A2] A circuit arrangement to drive a low pressure discharge lamp from a low voltage source is designed as a single-ended blocking oscillator possessing a transistor and a transformer. The primary winding is in series with the switching path of the transistor. There are two secondary windings, one serving to trigger the transistor's control electrode. One terminal of the primary is connected to one terminal of the same secondary winding. The other primary terminal is connected via a lamp electrode subject to a preheat voltage and via a diode to the other terminal of the secondary. Two other arrangements with different connections of the primary and secondaries are given.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/292; H02M 3/338

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/24 (2006.01); H05B 41/295 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/295 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649170 A1 19980528; CN 1172562 C 20041020; CN 1192118 A 19980902; EP 0845927 A2 19980603; EP 0845927 A3 19990630; EP 0845927 B1 20021127; HK 1015113 A1 20050513; JP H10162974 A 19980619

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708816

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59708816

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59708816

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59708816

- Effective date: 20111130

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070908

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070908

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070908

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060911

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708816 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/292 A, 7H 02M 3/338 B

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010625

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 05B 41/29 A, 6H 02M 3/338 B

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL