Global patent index - EP 0845987 A4

EP 0845987 A4 2000-05-24 - C-PROTEINASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS RELATED TO THE OVERPRODUCTION OF COLLAGEN

Title (en)

C-PROTEINASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS RELATED TO THE OVERPRODUCTION OF COLLAGEN

Title (de)

C - PROTEINASEINHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STÖRUNGEN, DIE MIT EINER KOLLAGENÜBERPRODUKTION ZUSAMMENHÄNGEN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE LA C-PROTEINASE DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DES AFFECTIONS LIEES A LA SURPRODUCTION DE COLLAGENE

Publication

EP 0845987 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96930499 A

Priority

  • US 9612876 W
  • US 203895 P
  • US 60120396 A
  • US 60918796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705865A1] The present invention relates to the novel use of organic molecules capable of inhibiting C-proteinase activity in order to regulate, modulate and/or inhibit abnormal collagen formation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/215; A61K 31/165; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/66; A61K 31/70; C07C 259/06; C07C 311/29; C07C 323/60; C07D 207/48; C07F 9/40; C07K 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 5/24 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 259/06 (2006.01); C07C 311/19 (2006.01); C07C 311/29 (2006.01); C07C 323/60 (2006.01); C07D 207/48 (2006.01); C07F 9/24 (2006.01); C07F 9/40 (2006.01); C07K 5/02 (2006.01); C07K 5/072 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/022 (2013.01); C07C 259/06 (2013.01); C07C 311/29 (2013.01); C07C 323/60 (2013.01); C07D 207/48 (2013.01); C07F 9/4006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0606046 A1 19940713 - CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]
  • [X] US 4687841 A 19870818 - SPILBURG CURTIS A [US], et al
  • [X] WO 9115507 A1 19911017 - BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]
  • [X] EP 0262399 A2 19880406 - TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, no. 17, 22 October 1990, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 147795, ODAKE, SHINJIRO ET AL: "Vertebrate collagenase inhibitor. I. Tripeptidyl hydroxamic acids" XP002134085 & CHEM. PHARM. BULL. ( 1990 ), 38(4), 1007-11, 1990CHEM. PHARM. BULL. ( 1990 ), 38(4), 1007-111990
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 23, 5 June 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 205068, LELIEVRE, Y. ET AL: "Synovial collagenase inhibition by actinonin. Structure-activity relations" XP002134086 & PATHOL. BIOL. ( 1989 ), 37(1), 43-6, 1989PATHOL. BIOL. ( 1989 ), 37(1), 43-61989
  • [X] BRINGMANN, GERHARD ET AL: "Acetogenic isoquinoline alkaloids. 66. First total synthesis of korupensamines A and B", HETEROCYCLES ( 1994 ), 39(2), 503-8, 1994, XP000561812
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 123, no. 23, 4 December 1995, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 314466, OUCHI, T. ET AL: "Synthesis of polydepsipeptide with pendant carboxylic acid groups and its hydrolysis behavior" XP002134087 & STUD. POLYM. SCI. ( 1994 ), 12(BIODEGRADABLE PLASTICS AND POLYMERS), 528-33, 1994STUD. POLYM. SCI. ( 1994 ), 12(BIODEGRADABLE PLASTICS AND POLYMERS), 528-331994
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 17, 27 April 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 174753, PERICH, JOHN W. ET AL: "Synthesis of casein-related peptides and phosphopeptides. XVI. The efficient synthesis of the casein-related O-phosphoseryl-containing peptide Ac-Glu-Ser(P)-Leu-Ser(P)-Ser(P)-Ser(P)-Glu-Glu-NHMe" XP002134088 & AUST. J. CHEM. ( 1992 ), 45(2), 385-94, 1992AUST. J. CHEM. ( 1992 ), 45(2), 385-941992
  • See also references of WO 9705865A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705865 A1 19970220; AU 6951296 A 19970305; BR 9609883 A 19990323; CA 2229098 A1 19970220; CN 1198096 A 19981104; EP 0845987 A1 19980610; EP 0845987 A4 20000524; JP H11511137 A 19990928; MX 9801093 A 19980430

INPADOC legal status

2000-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-05-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/215 A, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B, 7A 61K 31/66 B, 7A 61K 31/165 B, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 31/34 B, 7C 07C 259/06 B, 7C 07C 311/29 B, 7C 07D 207/48 B, 7C 07C 323/60 B, 7C 07K 5/02 B, 7C 07F 9/40 B

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980306

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE