Global Patent Index - EP 0845990 A4

EP 0845990 A4 2001-02-14 - NEW USE OF PREGNANE-DIONES AS ANALGESIC AGENTS

Title (en)

NEW USE OF PREGNANE-DIONES AS ANALGESIC AGENTS

Title (de)

NEUE VERWENDUNG VON PREGNANDIONEN ALS ANALGETIKA

Title (fr)

NOUVEL EMPLOI DE PREGNANES-DIONES COMME ANALGESIQUES

Publication

EP 0845990 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96927448 A

Priority

  • AU 9600531 W
  • AU PN498095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707807A1] The present invention provides: the new use of compounds of formula (II) wherein R<1> is H or Me, preferably H; R<2> is OH, preferably in alpha conformation; R<3> is H, or R<2> and R<3>, taken together, are O; R<4> is H or Me, preferably Me, and preferably in alpha conformation; R<5> is H; R<6> is H; or R<5> and R6, taken together, are O; R<7> is H or Me, preferably H; R<8> is H, Me or -CH2 O CO CH3. The present invention also provides a method of analgesia comprising administering an effective amount of a compound of formula (II) wherein R<1> est H or Me, preferably H; R<2> is OH, preferably in alpha conformation; R<3> is H, or R<2> and R<3>, taken together, are O; R<4> is H or Me, preferably Me, and preferably in alpha conformation; R<5> is H; R<6> is H; or R<5> and R<6>, taken together, are O; R<7> is H or Me, preferably H; R<8> is H, Me or -CH2 O CO CH3. The present invention also provides an analgesic composition comprising a compound of formula (II) wherein R<1> is H or Me, preferably H; R<2> is OH, preferably in alpha conformation; R<3> is H, or R<2> and R<3>, taken together, are O; R<4> is H or Me, preferably Me, and preferably in alpha conformation; R<5> is H; R<6> is H; or R<5> and R<6>, taken together, are O; R<7> is H or Me, preferably H; R<8> is H, Me or -CH2 O CO CH3 together with a pharmaceutically acceptable diluent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/57

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/56 (2006.01); A61K 31/57 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/573 (2013.01); A61K 31/56 (2013.01); A61K 31/57 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/57 + A61K 31/57 + A61K 31/56 + A61K 31/485
  2. A61K 31/56 + A61K 31/56 + A61K 31/485
  3. A61K 31/56 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 31/57 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5439900 A 19950808 - BUKUSOGLU CUNEYT [US], et al
  • [X] ERIKSSON H ET AL: "Comparison of eltanolone and thiopental in anaesthesia for termination of pregnancy.", ACTA ANAESTHESIOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA, vol. 39, no. 4, 1995, pages 479 - 484, XP000965595, ISSN: 0001-5172
  • [X] CARL...: "pharmacokinetics and pharmacodynamics of...", ACTA ANESTHESIOLOGY SCAND., vol. 38, no. 7, 1994, pages 734 - 741, XP000965594
  • [XA] SELYE: "correlations between...", ENDOCRINOLOGY, vol. 30, 1942, pages 437 - 453, XP000974346
  • See also references of WO 9707807A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707807 A1 19970306; AU PN498095 D0 19950914; EP 0845990 A1 19980610; EP 0845990 A4 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100219

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021211

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 31/57 20060101AFI20060828BHEP

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61P 25/04 20060101ALI20060828BHEP

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOODCHILD, COLIN, STANLEY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NADESON, RAYMOND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GOODCHILD, COLIN, STANLEY

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NADESON, RAYMOND

2001-02-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000103

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980223

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE