Global Patent Index - EP 0846021 B1

EP 0846021 B1 2001-03-14 - SLIDING APPLIANCE

Title (en)

SLIDING APPLIANCE

Title (de)

GLEITGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE GLISSE

Publication

EP 0846021 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96925590 A

Priority

  • AT 9600142 W
  • AT 137495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9706864A1] A sliding appliance, in particular a ski (1), has a supporting structure (1'), a core (11) joined thereto in an at least substantially rigid manner, and a binding support arranged above the core (11)in the longitudinal middle section of the sliding appliance and that extends in the longitudinal direction of the sliding appliance at least over the area of the binding. The binding support is elastically supported in relation to the supporting structure and core (11) in order to prevent vibrations and shocks from being transmitted from the ski (1) to the ski binding. In order to increase its stiffness and to improve the transmission of forces, the binding support is designed as a deflection resistant monocoque carrier (2; 2'; 2") that surrounds the core (11) laterally as well.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/075 (2006.01); A63C 5/07 (2006.01); A63C 5/12 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2013.01); A63C 5/12 (2013.01); A63C 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9706864 A1 19970227; AT 199651 T 20010315; AT 405139 B 19990525; AT A137495 A 19981015; DE 59606594 D1 20010419; EP 0846021 A1 19980610; EP 0846021 B1 20010314; JP 3877007 B2 20070207; JP H11510420 A 19990914; US 5944335 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130807

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130807

2014-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606594

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 199651

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130807

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120811

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ABP PATENTMARKETING GMBH

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606594

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19970916

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199651

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991111

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970916

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 970916