Global Patent Index - EP 0846034 B1

EP 0846034 B1 2000-11-08 - METHOD FOR POWDER COATING AND POWDER FOR USE IN SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR POWDER COATING AND POWDER FOR USE IN SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PULVERBESCHICHTUNG UND IN DIESEM VERFAHREN VERWANDTES PULVER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'APPLICATION DE REVETEMENT PAR POUDRE, ET POUDRE UTILE A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 0846034 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96927229 A

Priority

  • SE 9601003 W
  • SE 9502795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705963A1] A method and a powder for powder coating in which objects (2) which are to be powder coated are prepared in order to temporarily retain the powder, whereafter the powder is applied onto the object in a layer which is retained on the object until the powder, by means of melting and transformation to a solid state by means of curing, is caused to form a coating layer on the surfaces of the object. The powder is prepared in order to have a low melting and softening temperature below about 100 DEG C and preferably 60-100 DEG C, and comprises an initiator system arranged to bring the powder material to curing under the influence of electromagnetic radiation. The powder prepared in this way is heated on the object to a temperature such that it melts and forms an adherent layer on the coated surfaces of the object. Thereafter, this layer is subjected to the radiation, thus curing it to a coating layer covering the powder-coated surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/06 (2006.01); B05D 1/12 (2006.01); B05D 3/02 (2006.01); B05D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/067 (2013.01); B05D 1/06 (2013.01); B05D 3/0209 (2013.01); B05D 3/0218 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705963 A1 19970220; AT 197414 T 20001111; AU 6711996 A 19970305; CA 2229174 A1 19970220; CN 1108197 C 20030514; CN 1198108 A 19981104; DE 69610930 D1 20001214; DE 69610930 T2 20010607; DK 0846034 T3 20010305; EE 9800047 A 19980817; EP 0846034 A1 19980610; EP 0846034 B1 20001108; ES 2154415 T3 20010401; MX 9801095 A 19981129; NO 980547 A 19980402; NO 980547 D0 19980209; PL 182899 B1 20020329; PL 324925 A1 19980622; PT 846034 E 20010430; RU 2192315 C2 20021110; SE 504784 C2 19970421; SE 9502795 D0 19950810; SE 9502795 L 19970211

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20030428

2004-02-27 [REG PT MF4A] REVOCATION OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MF4A

- Effective date: 20031217

2004-02-24 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2004-01-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20030428

2004-01-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20030428

2003-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-08-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020815

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-09 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-16 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BECKER ACROMA AB

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: WINIFRED JOYCE EYLES

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BAYER AG

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: EISENMANN MASCHINENBAU KG

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: EWALD DOERKEN AG

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BASF COATINGS AG

2001-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

2001-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BECKER ACROMA AB

2001-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: WINIFRED JOYCE EYLES

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BECKER ACROMA AB

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: WINIFRED JOYCE EYLES

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BAYER AG

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EISENMANN MASCHINENBAU KG

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EWALD DOERKEN AG

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BASF COATINGS AG

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL POWDER COATINGS LTD.

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BECKER ACROMA AB

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: WINIFRED JOYCE EYLES

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BAYER AG

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EISENMANN MASCHINENBAU KG

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EWALD DOERKEN AG

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BASF COATINGS AG

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-09-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-09-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BECKER ACROMA AB

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-09-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: WINIFRED JOYCE EYLES

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-09-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-09-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BECKER ACROMA AB

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154415

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UCB S.A.

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-03-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-02-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-14

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19980305;LV PAYMENT 19980305

2000-11-08 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197414

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUPONT POWDER COATINGS SCANDINAVIA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990810

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980305

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 980305;LV PAYMENT 980305