Global Patent Index - EP 0846037 B1

EP 0846037 B1 2001-02-28 - MOULDED BODY MADE OF METALLIC POWDER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

MOULDED BODY MADE OF METALLIC POWDER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

FORMKÖRPER AUS METALLPULVER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PIECE MOULE EN POUDRE METALLIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0846037 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96928457 A

Priority

  • DE 19531077 A
  • EP 9603573 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19531077A1] The invention relates to a moulded body sintered and/or compacted from metallic powder and provided with at least one working surface. This moulded body may, for example, be a mirror holding plate (2), wherein the working surface is the adhesive surface. The object of the invention is to produce a moulded body which has a surface texture (3) of the working surface, which texture is adapted in an optimum manner to the respective application. The object is attained according to the invention by a moulded body sintered and/or compacted from metallic powder and provided with at least one working surface having a surface texture formed by a plurality of convexities and concavities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 26/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531077 A1 19970227; EP 0846037 A1 19980610; EP 0846037 B1 20010228; ES 2155619 T3 20010516; WO 9707916 A1 19970306

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080814

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080814

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080813

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155619 T3

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606522 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GKN SINTER METALS GMBH

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-03-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: GKN SINTER METALS GMBH & CO. KG RADEVORMWALD

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980219

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT