Global Patent Index - EP 0846075 B1

EP 0846075 B1 2000-07-26 - CLOSURE

Title (en)

CLOSURE

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0846075 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96930090 A

Priority

  • DE 19531341 A
  • EP 9603728 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19531341A1] The invention concerns a closure comprising a lid (2) and a body (1), wherein part (3) of the body (1) can be pressed in radially and secured in the pressed-in position to form a recessed grip. The part (3) can be secured permanently and non-detachably and can thus act as a tamperproof device indicating that the closure is opened for the first time. In addition, an indicator plate (6), which is torn off when the part which can be pressed in is pressed in, can be provided as a further tamperproof device. Furthermore, when the lid has been raised, the part which can be pressed in can return to its initial position, such that when the lid is closed again, the closure can only be re-opened when the part which can be pressed in is pressed in again. This embodiment provides a tamperproof device in the form of an indicator plate (6) disposed on the part which can be pressed in. Furthermore, the return of the pressed-in part into its initial position provides a child-proof closure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/02; B65D 50/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 50/04 (2006.01); B65D 50/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 50/045 (2013.01); B65D 50/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531341 A1 19970227; AR 003336 A1 19980708; AT 194953 T 20000815; AU 6927996 A 19970319; BR 9610109 A 19990223; CA 2229928 A1 19970306; CN 1193944 A 19980923; CO 4520314 A1 19971015; EP 0846075 A1 19980610; EP 0846075 B1 20000726; MX 9801525 A 19981031; US 6170710 B1 20010109; WO 9708074 A1 19970306

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605656

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120823

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120823

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120823

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110819

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-10-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-11-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ZELLER PLASTIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-10-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605656 20000831

2000-08-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2000-07-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194953 T 20000815

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990824

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980317

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI