Global patent index - EP 0846199 B1

EP 0846199 B1 2001-01-24 - TREATMENT OF PULP WITH CHELATING AGENT IN AT LEAST TWO MIXING STEPS WITHOUT INTERMEDIATE WASHING

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF PULP WITH CHELATING AGENT IN AT LEAST TWO MIXING STEPS WITHOUT INTERMEDIATE WASHING

Title (de)

ZELLSTOFFBEHANDLUNG MIT EINEM KOMPLEXBILDNER IN MINDESTENS ZWEI MISCHUNGSTUFEN OHNE ZWISCHENWÄSCHE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT D'UNE PATE A PAPIER AVEC UN AGENT CHELATANT EN AU MOINS DEUX ETAPES DE MELANGE, SANS LAVAGE INTERMEDIAIRE

Publication

EP 0846199 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96928765 A

Priority

  • SE 9600996 W
  • SE 9502962 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9708380A1] A method of chlorine-free bleaching of pulp where metals are removed by means of a chelating agent. The chelating agent is admixed to the pulp in at least two subsequent mixing steps without intermediate washing. The stay-time between the mixing steps shall be less than 15 minutes, and the pulp is washed after the last mixing step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/10; D21C 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/1042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9708380 A1 19970306; AT 198916 T 20010215; AU 6839996 A 19970319; BR 9610199 A 19980804; CA 2229212 A1 19970306; DE 69611680 D1 20010301; DE 69611680 T2 20010510; EP 0846199 A1 19980610; EP 0846199 B1 20010124; ES 2153593 T3 20010301; NO 980753 A 19980224; NO 980753 D0 19980223; PT 846199 E 20010629; SE 504803 C2 19970428; SE 9502962 D0 19950824; SE 9502962 L 19970225

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-08-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-08-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040809

2004-08-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040809

2003-08-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030825

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-18 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010816

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-25 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153593

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611680

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-01

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE

2001-01-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198916

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET FIBERTECH AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUNDS DEFIBRATOR INDUSTRIES AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000221

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980207

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE