Global patent index - EP 0846204 B1

EP 0846204 B1 2000-04-26 - SAFETY DEVICE FOR A CULVERT

Title (en)

SAFETY DEVICE FOR A CULVERT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHERUNG EINES STRASSENKANALDURCHLASSES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE LA BUSE DU PUISARD D'UNE ROUTE

Publication

EP 0846204 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96926259 A

Priority

  • AT 9600145 W
  • AT 143495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9708391A1] A device for preventing a culvert against being frontally hit by a vehicle arriving from the raised roadway, having a trapezoidal approach slab (1) of a material capable of bearing the weight of a vehicle, one trapezoid side of which can be supported on the roadway slope, with its longer trapezoid base (1'') on the front of the culvert at the height of the roadway or the like and with its shorter base (1') on the culvert base and with its other trapezoid side on the culvert slope opposite the roadway and/or on a surface bordering the culvert and lying lower down than the level of the roadway, in which the approach slab has a water inlet (4) covered by a grid (5) in the region of the smaller trapezoid base.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9708391 A1 19970306; AT 192200 T 20000515; AT 402413 B 19970526; AT A143495 A 19960915; DE 59605062 D1 20000531; EP 0846204 A1 19980610; EP 0846204 B1 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-06-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605062

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-03-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000813

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605062

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192200

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990518

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980217

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI