Global Patent Index - EP 0846224 B1

EP 0846224 B1 2000-12-27 - FUEL SUPPLY PUMP FOR A FUEL INJECTION PUMP FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL SUPPLY PUMP FOR A FUEL INJECTION PUMP FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFF-FÖRDERPUMPE FÜR EINE KRAFTSTOFF-EINSPRITZPUMPE FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

POMPE D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT POUR POMPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0846224 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915286 A

Priority

  • DE 9700273 W
  • DE 19625565 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625565A1] The invention relates to a fuel supply pump for a fuel injection pump for internal combustion engines, with a driven pair of meshing pinions (7, 9) rotating in a pump chamber (3) or other rotary conveying components which feed the fuel from a suction chamber (13) connected to a tank along a supply channel (17) formed between the faces of the pinions (7, 9) and the peripheral wall of the pump chamber (3) to a pressure chamber (15) connected to the fuel injection pump, and with a by-pass channel (25), integrated into a housing (1) of the fuel supply pump and connecting the suction (13) and pressure (15) chambers, which can be controlled by means of a pressure valve (31) fitted therein, where the suction chamber (13) can be closed by a check valve (40) acting against the fuel supply device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/04; F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/04 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04C 14/26 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625565 A1 19980108; DE 19625565 C2 19980723; CZ 290647 B6 20020911; CZ 9800548 A3 19981014; EP 0846224 A1 19980610; EP 0846224 B1 20001227; US 6099263 A 20000808; WO 9749910 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070213

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070213

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070213

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070214

2006-04-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060407

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-03-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702810 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990426

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980630

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE