Global Patent Index - EP 0846329 B1

EP 0846329 B1 2000-04-05 - HEAT TRANSFER ELEMENT FOR THERMAL CONTROLS

Title (en)

HEAT TRANSFER ELEMENT FOR THERMAL CONTROLS

Title (de)

WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSELEMENT FÜR THERMISCHE STEUERUNGEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS DE DISPOSITIFS DE COMMANDE THERMIQUES

Publication

EP 0846329 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96928535 A

Priority

  • GB 9602046 W
  • GB 9517094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707319A1] Thermal controls for electric kettles and the like commonly have a bimetallic switch-operating element (108) juxtaposed in heat transfer relationship with the heating element (222) of the kettle, and a heat sink compound in grease or paste form is commonly introduced between the bimetallic element and the heating element. The heat sink compound is relatively costly and is messy and difficult to apply with precision in an automatic manufacturing process. To overcome these problems which have plagued the industry for many years, the present invention proposes to use a pad or patch of self-adhesive heat transfer tape (130) rather than the heat sink compound, such heat transfer tapes previously having been used only in the electronics industry for heat sinking of power transistors and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/34; A47J 27/21; H01H 37/04; H05B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/04 (2006.01); H01H 37/34 (2006.01); H05B 1/02 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 1/0213 (2013.01); H01H 37/043 (2013.01); H01H 37/34 (2013.01); H01H 37/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707319 A1 19970227; AU 6826696 A 19970312; CN 1200194 A 19981125; DE 69607630 D1 20000511; DE 69607630 T2 20000727; EP 0846329 A1 19980610; EP 0846329 B1 20000405; GB 2304468 A 19970319; GB 2304468 B 19970806; GB 9517094 D0 19951025; HK 1001850 A1 19980710

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-08-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010810

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607630 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IE IT

2000-03-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IE IT

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980617

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980318

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IE IT