Global Patent Index - EP 0846361 A4

EP 0846361 A4 2000-05-03 - CONTROL AND TERMINATION OF A BATTERY CHARGING PROCESS

Title (en)

CONTROL AND TERMINATION OF A BATTERY CHARGING PROCESS

Title (de)

STEUERUNG UND BEENDIGUNG EINES BATTERIELADEVORGANGS

Title (fr)

CONTROLE ET ARRET D'UN PROCESSUS DE CHARGEMENT DE BATTERIE

Publication

EP 0846361 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96923731 A

Priority

  • US 102495 P
  • US 9611466 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703489A1] A method and an apparatus for adjusting the process of charging a battery so as to charge the battery as rapidly as possible while avoiding overheating of or damage to the battery. The method provides for applying a charging pulse (C1) which provides an average charging current, applying a first depolarizing pulse (D1), waiting for a first rest period (DW1), measuring the voltage (V1) at a predetermined point within the first rest period, applying a second depolarizing pulse (D2), waiting for a second rest period (DW2), measuring the voltage (V2) at the predetermined point within the second rest period, determining a difference between the voltage (V1) and the voltage (V2), and decreasing the average charging current if the difference is greater than a predetermined amount. The present invention also provides for determining whether the battery is low on water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02J 7/10; H02J 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/04 (2006.01); H01M 10/44 (2006.01); H02J 7/00 (2006.01); H02J 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02J 7/0093 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9703489A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703489 A1 19970130; AU 6459796 A 19970210; AU 710799 B2 19990930; BR 9609599 A 19990817; CA 2226411 A1 19970130; CN 1078397 C 20020123; CN 1190499 A 19980812; EA 000240 B1 19990225; EP 0846361 A1 19980610; EP 0846361 A4 20000503; IL 122821 D0 19980816; JP H11509078 A 19990803; MX 9800293 A 19980930; NO 980111 A 19980310; NO 980111 D0 19980109; NZ 312602 A 20000228

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2001-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENREV CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 02J 7/10 A, 7H 02J 7/00 B

1998-09-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PODRAZHANSKY, YURY, M.

1998-09-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TSENTER, BORIS

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980204

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 980204;LT PAYMENT 980204;LV PAYMENT 980204;SI PAYMENT 980204