Global Patent Index - EP 0846429 A3

EP 0846429 A3 2000-05-17 - A chair structure

Title (en)

A chair structure

Title (de)

Stuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise

Publication

EP 0846429 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97203375 A

Priority

IT PD960301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846429A2] The chair structure described comprises a seat (5) and a backrest (6) which are adjustable independently of one another according to the desired conditions of support. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/022

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/022 (2006.01); A47C 7/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/40 (2013.01); A47C 1/022 (2013.01); A47C 7/024 (2013.01); A47C 7/405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0846429 A2 19980610; EP 0846429 A3 20000517; IT 1288007 B1 19980910; IT PD960301 A1 19980608

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030731

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020517

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE