Global patent index - EP 0846430 A3

EP 0846430 A3 2000-06-14 - Lounge chair with a lock

Title (en)

Lounge chair with a lock

Title (de)

Liegestuhl mit einem Schloss

Title (fr)

Fauteuil de relaxation avec serrure

Publication

EP 0846430 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97113726 A

Priority

DE 19649951 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846430A2] The lock (5) can be released by an authorisation device (6) and also has a reservation function which interacts with the authorisation device. The reservation function can be operated as an alternative to releasing the locking mechanism. The authorisation device can be a punch card, chip card, magnetic card, transponder. The lock can have for reservation a cylinder lock with associated key or number lock. The lock and/or authorisation device has a data memory for storing data individualising the authorisation device. At the end of a predetemined time the data memory cancels out received data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/14; A47C 1/13; A47C 7/60; G07F 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/13 (2006.01); A47C 1/14 (2006.01); A47C 7/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/14 (2013.01); A47C 1/13 (2013.01); A47C 7/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649951 A1 19980604; EP 0846430 A2 19980610; EP 0846430 A3 20000614

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 1/14 A, 7A 47C 1/13 B, 7A 47C 7/60 B, 7G 07F 17/08 B

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE