Global Patent Index - EP 0846514 B1

EP 0846514 B1 2000-12-20 - A continuous casting nozzle for casting molten steel

Title (en)

A continuous casting nozzle for casting molten steel

Title (de)

Ausguss für den Einsatz im Stahl-Strangguss

Title (fr)

Busette de coulée pour usage dans la coulée continue d'acier

Publication

EP 0846514 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97118925 A

Priority

JP 34259796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846514A1] The invention is related to a continuous casting nozzle for casting of aluminum killed steel without clogging of the bore of the nozzle. The surface layer of the bore of the continuous casting nozzle contacting with the molten steel is formed of a refractory comprising graphite from 10 to 35 wt%, an aggregate of 10 to 60 wt% selected from from alumina matter, zirconia matter, zircon matter, or alumina-silica matter and roseki containing the pyrophyllite (Al2O3.4SiO2.H2O) as the main component as the rest part of the above mentioned materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/16 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 41/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0846514 A1 19980610; EP 0846514 B1 20001220; AT 198172 T 20010115; AU 4522997 A 19980611; AU 730801 B2 20010315; CA 2223356 A1 19980605; CA 2223356 C 20020723; DE 69703729 D1 20010125; DE 69703729 T2 20010419; JP H10166116 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703729 20010125

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198172 T 20010115

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990326

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980610

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI