Global Patent Index - EP 0846625 B1

EP 0846625 B1 2000-12-06 - Light and collapsible transport container

Title (en)

Light and collapsible transport container

Title (de)

Leichter und zerlegbarer Transportbehälter

Title (fr)

Conteneur léger et démontable pour le transport

Publication

EP 0846625 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97490025 A

Priority

FR 9611229 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2753176A1] The container comprises a structure (1A) constituted from edge pieces (2,3,4) and upper, lower and side walls. The edge pieces are arranged to comprise a lower polygonal plate (8) with a support base on a support. An upper plate (9) is positioned parallel to the lower plate at a distance from it. Columns (3) extend between the two plates on three vertical edges parallel to the container with their ends (3A,3B) held in the plate corners. One of the side walls is constituted from layers of a supple material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/06; B65D 88/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/06 (2006.01); B65D 88/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/06 (2013.01); B65D 88/14 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00059 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00174 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00233 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00273 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00288 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00318 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00338 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00497 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00562 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00606 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00661 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00701 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00711 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00875 (2013.01); B65D 2519/0097 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2753176 A1 19980313; FR 2753176 B1 19981030; DE 69703647 D1 20010111; DE 69703647 T2 20010712; EP 0846625 A2 19980610; EP 0846625 A3 19981021; EP 0846625 B1 20001206; ES 2155245 T3 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110809

2012-12-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20121207

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110808

2012-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110808

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DUFOUR CHRISTOPHE

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LOSFELD GUY

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703647

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100804

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100802

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100802

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090708

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070808

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070803

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155245 T3

2001-03-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-02-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703647 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990802

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19980610

1998-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LOSFELD, GUY

1998-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUFOUR, CHRISTOPHE

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI