Global Patent Index - EP 0846640 B1

EP 0846640 B1 2001-12-19 - Textile machine for making cross-wound bobbins

Title (en)

Textile machine for making cross-wound bobbins

Title (de)

Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine textile pour la production de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 0846640 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119025 A

Priority

DE 19650932 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846640A2] The bobbin winder, to produce cross wound bobbins, has a mobile service unit (23). It is operated by a control computer (38) to generate a control command for at least one of the units to hold and manipulate the cross wound bobbin (11), for the bobbin doffing and empty sleeve replacement actions after the winding frame has been opened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/04; B65H 54/26; B65H 54/553

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2006.01); B65H 54/26 (2006.01); B65H 54/553 (2006.01); B65H 63/036 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/26 (2013.01); B65H 54/553 (2013.01); B65H 63/036 (2013.01); B65H 67/0411 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0846640 A2 19980610; EP 0846640 A3 19980916; EP 0846640 B1 20011219; DE 19650932 A1 19980610; JP 4181235 B2 20081112; JP H10175778 A 19980630; TR 199701453 A2 19980622; US 5853137 A 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705882

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2004-10-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705882 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010219

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990316

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI