Global Patent Index - EP 0846781 B1

EP 0846781 B1 2000-11-15 - Process of forming an aluminium sheet with excellent high speed superplastic formability

Title (en)

Process of forming an aluminium sheet with excellent high speed superplastic formability

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Aluminiumbleches mit hervorragender Hochgeschwindigkeitssuperplastizität

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'une tole en alliage d'aluminium presentant une excellente aptitude au formage superplastique à haute vitesse.

Publication

EP 0846781 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95940435 A

Priority

  • JP 9502564 W
  • JP 23770795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9708354A1] An alloy containing 3.0 to 8.0 wt.% of Mg, 0.001 to 0.1 wt.% of Ti and as small amounts of Fe and Si (as impurities) as 0.06 wt.% or below and the balance consisting of A1 and unavoidable impurities wherein the number per square millimeter of grains of an Al-Fe-Si compound having a diameter of 1 mu m or above is 2000 or below, the mean crystal grain diameter is 25 to 200 mu m and the elongation is 350 % or above as worked at 350 to 550 DEG C and a strain rate of 10<-2> to 10<0>/s. This alloy may further contain a small amount of Cu, Mn and/or Cr and is formed at a temperature of 350 to 550 DEG C and a strain rate of 10<-3> to 10<0>/s. An aluminum alloy sheet which is excellent in high-speed superplastic formability and therefore can be formed at high temperature and high speed is obtained and the use of this sheet shortens the forming time to improve the productivity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/06; C22F 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 3/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/06 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/06 (2013.01); C22F 1/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9708354 A1 19970306; DE 69519444 D1 20001221; DE 69519444 T2 20010613; EP 0846781 A1 19980610; EP 0846781 A4 19981118; EP 0846781 B1 20001115; JP 3145904 B2 20010312; JP H0959736 A 19970304; US 2001001969 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061212

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061212

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519444

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-07-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS OF FORMING AN ALUMINIUM SHEET WITH EXCELLENT HIGH SPEED SUPERPLASTIC FORMABILITY

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990126

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YOSHIDA, HIDEO, SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND., LTD.

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TANAKA, HIROKI, SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND., LTD.

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TAKIGUCHI, KOUICHIROU, SUMITOMO LIGHT MET.IND.LTD

1998-11-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19981002

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980117

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB